There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Emergency Rental Assistance and Rental Market Stabilization Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide emergency rental assistance under the Emergency Solutions Grants program of the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development in response to the public health emergency resulting from the coronavirus, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/12/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
05/12/2020Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 05/12/2020
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/13/2020
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/13/2020
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 05/13/2020
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/13/2020
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/21/2020
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/01/2020
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 06/01/2020
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 06/01/2020
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/11/2020
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 07/20/2020
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/20/2020
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 08/03/2020
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 08/03/2020
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/10/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs05/12/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3685. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/12/2020)

Emergency Rental Assistance and Rental Market Stabilization Act of 2020

This bill provides funding for the Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) to award additional grants under the Emergency Solutions Grant program to provide rental assistance for short-term and medium-term housing to homeless individuals or families, or those who are at risk of homelessness, and expands eligibility for such additional assistance.

For assistance provided under the bill, the term at risk of homelessness shall include individuals and families that have an income below 80% of the median income for the area (rather than 30% of the area median income, as under current law). Rental assistance provided under the bill shall generally be limited to 120% of the HUD-established fair market rent for the area, whereas currently rental assistance under the program is generally limited to 100% of an area's fair market rent.

Such assistance may not be conditioned on any prerequisite activities, such as receiving treatment.

HUD may, with some limitations, waive requirements or establish alternative requirements related to such assistance if doing so is necessary to respond to the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) public health emergency.