There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (9)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

BUILD Act
Building Up Independent Lives and Dreams Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

BUILD Act
Building Up Independent Lives and Dreams Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

BUILD Act
Building Up Independent Lives and Dreams Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

BUILD Act
Building Up Independent Lives and Dreams Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide regulatory relief to charitable organizations that provide housing assistance, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
01/13/2021Became Public Law No: 116-342. (TXT | PDF)
01/13/2021Signed by President.
01/01/2021Presented to President.
12/31/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H9172)
12/21/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/21/2020Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
02/07/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/13/2021Became Public Law No: 116-342. (TXT | PDF)
01/13/2021Signed by President.
01/01/2021SenatePresented to President.
12/31/2020-10:10amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/31/2020-10:10amHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9172)
12/31/2020-10:10amHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9172)
12/31/2020-10:10amHouseMrs. Dingell asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
12/21/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/21/2020-4:45pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/21/2020-4:33pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/21/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7901-7902)
12/21/2020SenateS.Amdt.2729 Amendment SA 2729 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/21/2020SenateS.Amdt.2729 Amendment SA 2729 proposed by Senator Cornyn for Senator Fischer. (consideration: CR S7901-7902; text: CR S7901-7902) In the nature of a substitute.
12/21/2020SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7901-7902)
12/21/2020SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
02/07/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1135)

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 02/07/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 04/10/2019
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 04/10/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 04/29/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 05/15/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs02/07/2019 Referred to
12/21/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.371. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-342 (01/13/2021)

Building Up Independent Lives and Dreams Act or the BUILD Act

This bill allows nonprofit organizations offering mortgage loans for charitable purposes to use certain alternative forms to satisfy disclosure requirements.