There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Renewable Fuel Feedstock Reimbursement Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to direct the Secretary of Agriculture to establish a renewable fuel feedstock reimbursement program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/19/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
05/19/2020Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (10)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/19/2020
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 06/02/2020
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 06/03/2020
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/03/2020
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 06/03/2020
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 06/16/2020
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/16/2020
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 06/16/2020
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 06/25/2020
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/28/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry05/19/2020 Referred to

As of 08/10/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.3756 - Renewable Fuel Feedstock Reimbursement Act of 2020


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3756. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/19/2020)

Renewable Fuel Feedstock Reimbursement Act of 2020

This bill directs the Department of Agriculture to carry out a program to provide payments to certain renewable fuel producers to reimburse them for purchases of renewable fuel feedstock that were made between January 1, 2020, and March 31, 2020.

The payment amount shall be equal to 75% of the purchase price of such feedstock.