Text: S.3756 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/19/2020)


116th CONGRESS
2d Session
S. 3756


To direct the Secretary of Agriculture to establish a renewable fuel feedstock reimbursement program.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

May 19, 2020

Mr. Grassley (for himself and Ms. Klobuchar) introduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry


A BILL

To direct the Secretary of Agriculture to establish a renewable fuel feedstock reimbursement program.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Renewable Fuel Feedstock Reimbursement Act of 2020”.

SEC. 2. Renewable fuel feedstock reimbursement program.

(a) Definitions.—In this section:

(1) ELIGIBLE ENTITY.—The term “eligible entity” means an entity that produces renewable fuel used as transportation fuel (as those terms are defined in section 211(o)(1) of the Clean Air Act (42 U.S.C. 7545(o)(1))).

(2) ELIGIBLE FEEDSTOCK.—The term “eligible feedstock” means renewable biomass described in section 211(o)(1)(I)(i) of the Clean Air Act (42 U.S.C. 7545(o)(1)(I)(i)) that is intended to be used to produce the renewable fuel described in paragraph (1).

(3) SECRETARY.—The term “Secretary” means the Secretary of Agriculture.

(b) Establishment of program.—Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the Secretary shall use such sums as are necessary of the funds of the Commodity Credit Corporation to carry out a program to provide payments to eligible entities to reimburse the eligible entities for purchases of eligible feedstocks that were made during the period beginning on January 1, 2020, and ending on March 31, 2020.

(c) Payment amount.—The amount of a payment under subsection (b) shall be an amount equal to 75 percent of the purchase price of eligible feedstock paid by an eligible entity.

(d) Proof of cost.—The Secretary shall determine the documentation that an eligible entity shall provide to the Secretary to demonstrate the purchase price and quantity of eligible feedstock purchased by the eligible entity to receive a payment under subsection (b).

(e) Agreements.—To be eligible to receive a payment under subsection (b), an eligible entity shall enter into an agreement with the Secretary, as determined by the Secretary.

(f) Report.—Not later than 180 days after the date of enactment of this Act, the Secretary shall submit to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry of the Senate and the Committee on Agriculture of the House of Representatives a report on the payments made under subsection (b), including an identification of each eligible entity that received a payment and the amount received.

(g) Regulations.—

(1) IN GENERAL.—Not later than 30 days after the date of enactment of this Act, the Secretary shall promulgate such regulations as are necessary to carry out the program established under subsection (b).

(2) PROCEDURE.—The promulgation of the regulations and administration of the program established under subsection (b) shall be made without regard to—

(A) the notice and comment provisions of section 553 of title 5, United States Code;

(B) chapter 35 of title 44, United States Code (commonly known as the “Paperwork Reduction Act”); or

(C) the Statement of Policy of the Secretary of Agriculture (36 Fed. Reg. 13804 (July 24, 1971)) relating to notices of proposed rulemaking and public participation in rulemaking.


Share This