There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Fair Chance Act
Fair Chance to Compete for Jobs Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Fair Chance Act
Fair Chance to Compete for Jobs Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to prohibit Federal agencies and Federal contractors from requesting that an applicant for employment disclose criminal history record information before the applicant has received a conditional offer, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
04/10/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment. With written report No. 116-33.
02/07/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
04/10/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 69.
Action By: Senate
04/10/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment. With written report No. 116-33.
02/13/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/07/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 02/07/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 02/07/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 02/07/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/07/2019
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 02/07/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 02/11/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 02/12/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs02/07/2019 Referred to
02/13/2019 Markup by
04/10/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-33

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.387. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (04/10/2019)

Fair Chance to Compete for Jobs Act of 2019 or the Fair Chance Act

This bill prohibits federal agencies and federal contractors from requesting that applicants for employment disclose criminal history record information before receiving a conditional offer of employment.

Agencies may not require an individual or sole proprietor who submits a bid for a contract to disclose criminal history record information regarding that individual or sole proprietor before determining the apparent awardee.

The bill (1) sets forth positions to which such prohibitions shall not apply; and (2) requires the Office of Personnel Management (OPM), the General Services Administration (GSA), and the Department of Defense (DOD) to issue regulations identifying additional positions with respect to which the prohibition shall not apply.

The OPM, the Office of Congressional Workplace Rights, the Administrative Office of the United States Courts, the GSA, and DOD must (1) establish procedures for submitting complaints about, and taking actions against, agency employees and contractors for violating such prohibitions and for appealing such an action; and (2) issue regulations to implement this bill.

The Bureau of Justice Statistics, in coordination with the Bureau of the Census, must design and initiate a study on the employment of individuals who are released from federal prison after completing a term of imprisonment for a federal criminal offense.