There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Presidential Transition Enhancement Act of 2019

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Presidential Transition Enhancement Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Presidential Transition Enhancement Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

Presidential Transition Enhancement Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Presidential Transition Enhancement Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Presidential Transition Act of 1963 to improve the orderly transfer of the executive power during Presidential transitions.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
03/03/2020Became Public Law No: 116-121. (TXT | PDF)
03/03/2020Signed by President.
02/20/2020Presented to President.
02/05/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
08/01/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5318-5320; text: CR S5319-5320)
03/25/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 116-13.
02/07/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/03/2020Became Public Law No: 116-121. (TXT | PDF)
03/03/2020Signed by President.
02/20/2020SenatePresented to President.
02/05/2020-4:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/05/2020-4:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H825-826)
02/05/2020-4:05pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 394.
02/05/2020-4:05pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H825-827)
02/05/2020-4:04pmHouseMrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/02/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
08/02/2019-11:04amHouseReceived in the House.
08/01/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/01/2019SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5318-5320; text: CR S5319-5320)
03/25/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 44.
03/25/2019SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 116-13.
02/13/2019SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/07/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 02/07/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 02/07/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 07/30/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs02/07/2019 Referred to
02/13/2019 Markup by
03/25/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-13
House Oversight and Reform08/02/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.394. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-121 (03/03/2020)

Presidential Transition Enhancement Act of 2019

This bill makes changes intended to smooth the transfer of executive power during presidential transitions.

The bill provides for the detailing of legislative branch employees on a reimbursable basis to office staffs designated by the President-elect or Vice President-elect with the consent of the supervising Member of Congress.

The bill extends support provided by the General Services Administration (GSA) to the President- and Vice President-elect for up to 60 days after the inauguration.

By September 1 of a year during which a presidential election occurs, the GSA shall enter into a memorandum of understanding (MOU) with each eligible candidate, which shall include the conditions for administrative support services and facilities. To the maximum extent practicable, an MOU shall be based on MOUs relating to previous presidential transitions. Each MOU shall include an agreement that the eligible candidate will implement and enforce an ethics plan to guide the conduct of the transition beginning on the date on which such candidate becomes President-elect. The plan shall be published on the GSA website.

By September 15 of a year during which a presidential election occurs, each agency shall ensure that a succession plan is in place for each senior noncareer position in the agency.