There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Saudi Arabia Accountability and Yemen Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Saudi Arabia Accountability and Yemen Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to support the peaceful resolution of the civil war in Yemen, to address the resulting humanitarian crisis, and to hold the perpetrators responsible for murdering a Saudi dissident.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
07/30/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment. Without written report.
02/07/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
07/30/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 167.
Action By: Senate
07/30/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment. Without written report.
07/25/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/07/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN]* 02/07/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/07/2019
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 02/07/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 02/07/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/07/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 02/07/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations02/07/2019 Referred to
07/25/2019 Markup by
07/30/2019 Reported by

As of 08/11/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.398 - Saudi Arabia Accountability and Yemen Act of 2019


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.398. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (07/30/2019)

Saudi Arabia Accountability and Yemen Act of 2019

This bill suspends certain weapons transfers to Saudi Arabia. It also imposes sanctions on individuals for various activities related to the civil war in Yemen and for involvement in the death of Saudi Arabian journalist Jamal Khashoggi.

The United States may not authorize transfers to Saudi Arabia of missiles, ammunition, ground vehicles, aircraft, or other weapons that fall within Categories III, IV, VII, or VIII of the U.S. Munitions List. The prohibitions do not apply to ground-based missile defense systems and shall expire September 30, 2020.

The United States may not provide in-flight refueling for Saudi coalition aircraft involved in the civil war. (A Saudi-led coalition has been fighting against Ansar Allah, a group in armed conflict with the government of Yemen.)

The United States shall impose sanctions on individuals who are blocking the flow of humanitarian goods and services into Yemen or working to undermine the country's stability. This includes sanctions on supporters of Ansar Allah if the United States determines the group has not made meaningful efforts towards peace.

The bill also imposes sanctions on foreign individuals, including any members of the Saudi royal family, who are responsible for or who aided in Khashoggi's death.

The President shall impose import restrictions on cultural property unlawfully removed from Yemen on or after March 15, 2015.