There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (8)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

JUSTICE Act
Just and Unifying Solutions To Invigorate Communities Everywhere Act of 2020

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Breonna Taylor Notification Act of 2020
  • Commission on the Social Status of Black Men and Boys Act
  • George Floyd and Walter Scott Notification Act
  • Justice for Victims of Lynching Act of 2020
  • National Criminal Justice Commission Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to improve and reform policing practices, accountability, and transparency.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/17/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
06/24/2020Motion by Senator McConnell to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure was not invoked (Record Vote No. 126) entered in Senate.
Action By: Senate
06/24/2020Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 55 - 45. Record Vote Number: 126. (CR S3170)
Action By: Senate
06/22/2020Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (CR S3114)
Action By: Senate
06/22/2020Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S3114)
Action By: Senate
06/18/2020Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 480.
Action By: Senate
06/17/2020Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 06/17/2020
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Romney, Mitt [R-UT]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Loeffler, Kelly [R-GA]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK]* 06/17/2020
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/22/2020
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 06/23/2020

Committees (0)

As of 08/14/2020 text has not been received for S.3985 - JUSTICE Act

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.