There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Improving Telehealth for Underserved Communities Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to simplify payments for telehealth services furnished by Federally qualified health centers or rural health clinics under the Medicare program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/18/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
06/18/2020Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 06/18/2020
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/20/2020
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/23/2020
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 07/27/2020
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 07/30/2020
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 09/24/2020
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 12/11/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Finance06/18/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3998. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/18/2020)

Improving Telehealth for Underserved Communities Act of 2020

This bill establishes a particular Medicare payment methodology for telehealth services furnished by federally qualified health centers and rural health clinics during the public health emergency relating to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). Specifically, the bill requires payments to be made in accordance with the same methodology that is used for non-telehealth services, rather than in accordance with a separate methodology determined by the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services.