There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Introduced

RESTAURANTS Act of 2020
Real Economic Support That Acknowledges Unique Restaurant Assistance Needed To Survive Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish a $120,000,000,000 Restaurant Revitalization Fund to provide structured relief to food service or drinking establishments through December 31, 2020, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/18/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
06/18/2020Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ]* 06/18/2020
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 06/18/2020
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 06/18/2020
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 06/22/2020
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 06/23/2020
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 07/20/2020
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/20/2020
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 07/20/2020
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/21/2020
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 07/21/2020
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/28/2020
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/28/2020
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 07/28/2020
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/28/2020
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/28/2020
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 08/03/2020
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 08/03/2020
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 08/03/2020
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/03/2020
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 08/03/2020
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 08/03/2020
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 08/03/2020
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 08/03/2020
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 08/03/2020
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 08/03/2020
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 08/12/2020
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 08/13/2020
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/10/2020
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 09/10/2020
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/10/2020
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/10/2020
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/10/2020
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/10/2020
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 09/10/2020
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/10/2020
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 09/10/2020
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 09/10/2020
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 09/10/2020
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/15/2020
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 09/15/2020
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 10/20/2020
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 10/20/2020
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 10/20/2020
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 10/20/2020
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 10/20/2020
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 10/20/2020
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 10/20/2020
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 10/23/2020
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/30/2020
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 12/09/2020
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 12/16/2020
Sen. Kelly, Mark [D-AZ] 12/17/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Finance06/18/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.4012. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/18/2020)

Real Economic Support That Acknowledges Unique Restaurant Assistance Needed To Survive Act of 2020 or the RESTAURANTS Act of 2020

This bill temporarily establishes and provides funding for the Restaurant Revitalization Fund, from which the Department of the Treasury shall make grants to eligible food and beverage purveyors to cover specified costs.

For the grant program's initial period, Treasury must (1) prioritize awarding grants to marginalized and underrepresented communities, and (2) only award grants to eligible food and beverage purveyors with annual revenues of less than $1.5 million. Further, an entity that received a loan under the Paycheck Protection Program established to support small businesses in response to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) may not apply for or use a restaurant revitalization grant for the same expenses for which the entity received the paycheck protection loan.