There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Juneteenth National Independence Day Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 5, United States Code, to designate Juneteenth National Independence Day as a legal public holiday.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/22/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
06/22/2020Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 06/22/2020
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 06/22/2020
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE] 06/23/2020
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/24/2020
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/25/2020
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 06/25/2020
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/30/2020
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 07/01/2020
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/02/2020
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/02/2020
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/22/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary06/22/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.4019. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/22/2020)

Juneteenth National Independence Day Act

This bill designates Juneteenth National Independence Day, June 19, as a legal public holiday.