There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

COVID-19 Safer Detention Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to expand eligibility for and provide judicial review for the Elderly Home Detention Pilot Program, provide for compassionate release based on COVID-19 vulnerability, shorten the waiting period for judicial review during the COVID-19 pandemic, and make other technical corrections.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/22/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
06/22/2020Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S3127-3128)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/25/2020
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 07/20/2020
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/29/2020
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/29/2020
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/29/2020
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 07/29/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary06/22/2020 Referred to

As of 10/30/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.4034 - COVID-19 Safer Detention Act of 2020


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.