There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

RLF Act
Reinvigorating Lending for the Future Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

RLF Act
Reinvigorating Lending for the Future Act

Short Titles as Introduced

RLF Act
Reinvigorating Lending for the Future Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Public Works and Economic Development Act of 1965 to provide for the release of certain Federal interests in connection with certain grants under that Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (5)

Date Actions Overview
10/20/2020Presented to President.
10/01/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
08/06/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S5346)
08/06/2020Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/25/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/20/2020SenatePresented to President.
10/01/2020-4:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/01/2020-4:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5189-5190)
10/01/2020-4:13pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 4075.
10/01/2020-4:13pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5189-5190)
10/01/2020-4:12pmHouseMr. Carbajal moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/14/2020-2:26pmHouseHeld at the desk.
08/14/2020-2:04pmHouseReceived in the House.
08/11/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/06/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5346)
08/06/2020SenateSenate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5346)
06/25/2020SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Cosponsors (9)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 06/25/2020
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 07/21/2020
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/29/2020
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/30/2020
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 07/30/2020
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 08/03/2020
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 08/04/2020
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 08/04/2020
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 08/06/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works06/25/2020 Referred to
08/06/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.