There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Emergency Aid for Returning Americans Affected by Coronavirus Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Emergency Aid for Returning Americans Affected by Coronavirus Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Emergency Aid for Returning Americans Affected by Coronavirus Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Emergency Aid for Returning Americans Affected by Coronavirus Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend section 1113 of the Social Security Act to provide authority for fiscal year 2020 for increased payments for temporary assistance to United States citizens returned from foreign countries, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
07/13/2020Became Public Law No: 116-148. (TXT | PDF)
07/13/2020Signed by President.
07/01/2020Presented to President.
06/29/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H2669)
06/29/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S3628; text: CR S3628)
06/29/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/13/2020Became Public Law No: 116-148. (TXT | PDF)
07/13/2020Signed by President.
07/01/2020SenatePresented to President.
06/29/2020-8:45pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/29/2020-8:45pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H2669)
06/29/2020-8:44pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H2669)
06/29/2020-8:44pmHouseMr. Gomez asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
06/29/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/29/2020-3:54pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/29/2020SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3628; text: CR S3628)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 06/29/2020

Committees (0)

As of 09/20/2020 text has not been received for S.4091 - Emergency Aid for Returning Americans Affected by Coronavirus Act

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


As of 09/20/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.4091 - Emergency Aid for Returning Americans Affected by Coronavirus Act


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.4091. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-148 (07/13/2020)

Emergency Aid for Returning Americans Affected by Coronavirus Act

This bill increases the maximum amount of funding available in FY2020 for, and revises certain requirements pertaining to, temporary assistance for U.S. citizens and their dependents who are returning from foreign countries due to a crisis and are without available resources. Under current law, the Department of Health and Human Services may provide assistance such as money payments and medical care to these individuals on a temporary basis.

In providing temporary assistance during the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) emergency declared on January 31, 2020, only certain members of the Commissioned Corps of the Public Health Service shall have direct, in-person contact with those receiving assistance. Specifically, they must be uniformed, active-duty members of the Regular Reserve Corps or the Ready Reserve Corps. In addition, they must have received training on infection prevention and control and have access to personal protective equipment.