There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Ensuring Survivors Benefits during COVID-19 Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to secure medical opinions for veterans with service-connected disabilities who die from COVID-19 to determine whether their service-connected disabilities were the principal or contributory cases of death, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/02/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
07/02/2020Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 07/02/2020
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 09/08/2020
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 09/08/2020
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 09/15/2020
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 09/29/2020
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/30/2020
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 10/01/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/02/2020 Referred to

As of 10/28/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.4166 - Ensuring Survivors Benefits during COVID-19 Act of 2020


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.4166. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/02/2020)

Ensuring Survivors Benefits during COVID-19 Act of 2020

This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs to get a medical opinion to determine if a service-connected disability was the principal or contributory cause of death in situations where a veteran with a service-connected disability dies from COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019), or complications from COVID-19, and the death certificate does not clearly identify the service-connected disability as the principal or contributory cause of death.