There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Protecting Nonprofits from Catastrophic Cash Flow Strain Act of 2020

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protecting Nonprofits from Catastrophic Cash Flow Strain Act of 2020

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Protecting Nonprofits from Catastrophic Cash Flow Strain Act of 2020

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Nonprofits from Catastrophic Cash Flow Strain Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title IX of the Social Security Act to improve emergency unemployment relief for governmental entities and nonprofit organizations.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
08/03/2020Became Public Law No: 116-151. (TXT | PDF)
08/03/2020Signed by President.
07/22/2020Presented to President.
07/09/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
07/02/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4240; text: CR S4240)
07/02/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/03/2020Became Public Law No: 116-151. (TXT | PDF)
08/03/2020Signed by President.
07/22/2020SenatePresented to President.
07/09/2020-2:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/09/2020-2:03pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H3071)
07/09/2020-2:02pmHouseWithout objection, the Chair laid before the House S. 4209. (consideration: CR H3071)
07/06/2020-2:30pmHouseHeld at the desk.
07/06/2020-2:05pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/02/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/02/2020SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4240; text: CR S4240)

Cosponsors (26)


Committees (0)

As of 10/22/2020 text has not been received for S.4209 - Protecting Nonprofits from Catastrophic Cash Flow Strain Act of 2020

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.4209. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/02/2020)

Protecting Nonprofits from Catastrophic Cash Flow Strain Act of 2020

This bill permits certain governmental entities, federally recognized tribes, and nonprofit organizations to make up front payments of 50% of unemployment benefits into the state Unemployment Trust Fund (in lieu of contributions) to be used exclusively to reduce such payments resulting from the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) pandemic.

Currently, the Department of Labor issued guidance on April 27, 2020 (UIPL 18-20), requiring states to collect 100% of such payments up front and then reimburse them by 50% later.

In addition, the bill allows states to opt to issue such reimbursements or to reduce the amounts required to be paid for weeks of employment after March 12, 2020, and before enactment of this bill.