There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide States additional time relating to the appointment of electors and for the meeting of electors for the 2020 election for President and Vice President.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
08/06/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
08/06/2020Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Rules and Administration08/06/2020 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.4517.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.4517. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (08/06/2020)

This bill revises the electoral college time line for the 2020 presidential election.

First, the bill requires states to make final determinations of controversies or contests as to the appointment of electors by January 1, 2021. Currently, the deadline is December 8, 2020.

Further, the bill requires electors to meet in their respective states on January 2, 2021, to cast their votes for President and Vice President. Currently, electors must meet on December 14, 2020.