Summary: S.4517 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one summary for S.4517. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (08/06/2020)

This bill revises the electoral college time line for the 2020 presidential election.

First, the bill requires states to make final determinations of controversies or contests as to the appointment of electors by January 1, 2021. Currently, the deadline is December 8, 2020.

Further, the bill requires electors to meet in their respective states on January 2, 2021, to cast their votes for President and Vice President. Currently, electors must meet on December 14, 2020.