There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Office of Rural Broadband Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to direct the Federal Communications Commission to establish the Office of Rural Broadband, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/12/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
02/12/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/12/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 02/12/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/12/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/06/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 03/25/2019
Sen. Loeffler, Kelly [R-GA] 05/20/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation02/12/2019 Referred to

As of 12/05/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.454 - Office of Rural Broadband Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.454. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/12/2019)

Office of Rural Broadband Act

This bill establishes the Office of Rural Broadband to help coordinate federal efforts and resources to develop rural telecommunications systems and to track broadband subscription rates in rural areas.