There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

President George H.W. Bush and Barbara Bush Coin Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require that $1 coins issued during 2019 honor President George H.W. Bush and to direct the Secretary of the Treasury to issue bullion coins during 2019 in honor of Barbara Bush.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/12/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
02/12/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 02/12/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 02/12/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 02/12/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/12/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/01/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 05/01/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 05/02/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/02/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 05/02/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/06/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 05/06/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/07/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/14/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/14/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 05/15/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 05/16/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 05/16/2019
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 05/22/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/22/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 05/22/2019
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/22/2019
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 05/22/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 05/22/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/22/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 05/22/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 05/22/2019
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/22/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/22/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 05/22/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/22/2019
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/22/2019
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/22/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 05/22/2019
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/22/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 05/22/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 05/22/2019
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 05/23/2019
Sen. Romney, Mitt [R-UT] 05/23/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/23/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/03/2019
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/03/2019
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 06/04/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 06/11/2019
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 06/11/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/12/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 06/13/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 06/18/2019
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 06/18/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/18/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/18/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 06/18/2019
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 08/01/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 08/01/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/01/2019
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 10/17/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 10/17/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs02/12/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.457. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/12/2019)

President George H. W. Bush and Barbara Bush Coin Act

This bill requires the issuance of

  • $1 coins bearing the image of President George H.W. Bush for a one-year period beginning on January 1, 2019, and
  • bullion coins bearing the image of Barbara Bush during that same period.