There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

President George H.W. Bush and First Spouse Barbara Bush Coin Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

President George H.W. Bush and First Spouse Barbara Bush Coin Act

Short Titles as Introduced

President George H.W. Bush and Barbara Bush Coin Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require that $1 coins issued during 2019 honor President George H.W. Bush and to direct the Secretary of the Treasury to issue bullion coins during 2019 in honor of Barbara Bush.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
01/13/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H198)
12/16/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/16/2019Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
02/12/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
01/16/2020SenatePresented to President.
01/13/2020-6:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/13/2020-6:31pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H198)
01/13/2020-6:02pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 457.
01/13/2020-6:02pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H198-201)
01/13/2020-6:02pmHouseMs. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/17/2019-4:39pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/17/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/17/2019-2:07pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/16/2019SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/16/2019SenateS.Amdt.1257 Amendment SA 1257 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/16/2019SenateS.Amdt.1257 Amendment SA 1257 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Cornyn. (consideration: CR S7058; text: CR S7058) In the nature of a substitute.
12/16/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7058)
12/16/2019SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
02/12/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (66)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 02/12/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 02/12/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 02/12/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/12/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/01/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 05/01/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 05/02/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/02/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 05/02/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/06/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 05/06/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/07/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/14/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/14/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 05/15/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 05/16/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 05/16/2019
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 05/22/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/22/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 05/22/2019
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/22/2019
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 05/22/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 05/22/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/22/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 05/22/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 05/22/2019
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/22/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/22/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 05/22/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/22/2019
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/22/2019
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/22/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 05/22/2019
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/22/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 05/22/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 05/22/2019
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 05/23/2019
Sen. Romney, Mitt [R-UT] 05/23/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/23/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/03/2019
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/03/2019
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 06/04/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 06/11/2019
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 06/11/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/12/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 06/13/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 06/18/2019
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 06/18/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/18/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/18/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 06/18/2019
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 08/01/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 08/01/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/01/2019
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 10/17/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 10/17/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 10/30/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 10/30/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 10/31/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 11/05/2019
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 11/12/2019
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 11/18/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 11/18/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 11/18/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 11/19/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/20/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs02/12/2019 Referred to
12/16/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.457. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/12/2019)

President George H. W. Bush and Barbara Bush Coin Act

This bill requires the issuance of

  • $1 coins bearing the image of President George H.W. Bush for a one-year period beginning on January 1, 2019, and
  • bullion coins bearing the image of Barbara Bush during that same period.