There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

2020 Census Deadline Extensions Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to extend certain deadlines for the 2020 decennial census.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/15/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
09/15/2020Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 09/15/2020
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK]* 09/15/2020
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 09/16/2020
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 09/22/2020
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/30/2020
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 09/30/2020
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/30/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/15/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.4571. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (09/15/2020)

2020 Census Deadline Extensions Act

This bill extends certain deadlines for the U.S. Census Bureau to complete the 2020 decennial census of population.

The bill prohibits the bureau from concluding the Nonresponse Followup operation or the Self-Response operation before October 31, 2020.