There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to protect the healthcare of hundreds of millions of people of the United States and prevent efforts of the Department of Justice to advocate courts to strike down the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/22/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
10/01/2020Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 43. Record Vote Number: 200. (CR S6015)
Action By: Senate
09/29/2020Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (CR S5890)
Action By: Senate
09/29/2020Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S5890)
Action By: Senate
09/23/2020Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 551.
Action By: Senate
09/22/2020Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. (text: CR S5791)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (0)

As of 11/25/2020 text has not been received for S.4653 - A bill to protect the healthcare of hundreds of millions of people of the United States and prevent efforts of the Department of Justice to advocate courts to strike down the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


As of 11/25/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.4653 - A bill to protect the healthcare of hundreds of millions of people of the United States and prevent efforts of the Department of Justice to advocate courts to strike down the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.