There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

John D. Dingell, Jr. Conservation, Management, and Recreation Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

John D. Dingell, Jr. Conservation, Management, and Recreation Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Natural Resources Management Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Natural Resources Management Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the management of the natural resources of the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
03/12/2019Became Public Law No: 116-9.
03/12/2019Signed by President.
03/06/2019Presented to President.
02/26/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 363 - 62 (Roll no. 95).(text: CR H2142-2211)
02/12/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 92 - 8. Record Vote Number: 22.(text: CR S1196-1265)
01/08/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (47)

Date Chamber
03/12/2019Became Public Law No: 116-9.
03/12/2019Signed by President.
03/06/2019SenatePresented to President.
02/26/2019-7:35pmHousePursuant to the provisions of H. Con. Res. 21, enrollment corrections on S. 47 have been made.
02/26/2019-6:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/26/2019-6:42pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 363 - 62 (Roll no. 95). (text: CR H2142-2211)
02/26/2019-6:34pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2218-2219)
02/26/2019-6:08pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
02/26/2019-5:14pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the order of the House of today, the House proceeded with fifty minutes of debate on S. 47.
02/26/2019-5:14pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2141-2217)
02/26/2019-5:13pmHouseORDER OF BUSINESS - Mr. Grijalva asked unanimous consent that debate under 1(c) of Rule XV on a motion to suspend the rules relating to S. 47 be extended to 50 minutes. Agreed to without objection.
02/26/2019-5:13pmHouseMr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/13/2019-2:32pmHouseHeld at the desk.
02/13/2019-12:07pmHouseReceived in the House.
02/13/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/12/2019SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 92 - 8. Record Vote Number: 22. (text: CR S1196-1265)
02/12/2019SenateS.Amdt.111 Amendment SA 111 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
02/12/2019SenateS.Amdt.112 Amendment SA 112 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
02/12/2019SenateS.Amdt.182 Amendment SA 182 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
02/12/2019SenateConsidered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1178-1186, S1193-1265)
02/12/2019SenateS.Amdt.182 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1178, S1196)
02/12/2019SenateS.Amdt.112 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1178, S1196)
02/12/2019SenateS.Amdt.111 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1178, S1196)
02/11/2019SenateS.Amdt.182 Amendment SA 182 proposed by Senator Rubio to Amendment SA 112. (consideration: CR S1161; text: CR S1161) To give effect to more accurate maps of units of the John H. Chafee Coastal Barrier Resources System that were produced by digital mapping.
02/11/2019SenateCloture on the measure invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 87 - 7. Record Vote Number: 21. (CR S1161)
02/11/2019SenateS.Amdt.187 Motion to table amendment SA 187 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 60 - 33. Record Vote Number: 20.
02/11/2019SenateS.Amdt.187 Amendment SA 187 proposed by Senator Lee to Amendment SA 112. (consideration: CR S1160; text: CR S1160) To limit the extension or establishment of national monuments in the State of Utah.
02/11/2019SenateConsidered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1152-1162)
02/11/2019SenateS.Amdt.112 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1152)
02/11/2019SenateS.Amdt.111 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1152)
02/07/2019SenateCloture motion on the measure presented in Senate. (CR S1117)
02/07/2019SenateS.Amdt.112 Amendment SA 112 proposed by Senator Murkowski to Amendment SA 111. (consideration: CR S1109) To modify the authorization period for the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Historic Preservation program.
02/07/2019SenateS.Amdt.162 Motion to table amendment SA 162 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 68 - 30. Record Vote Number: 19.
02/07/2019SenateS.Amdt.162 Amendment SA 162 proposed by Senator Lee to Amendment SA 111. (consideration: CR S1109; text: CR S1109) To modify the authorization period of the Land and Water Conservation Fund.
02/07/2019SenateS.Amdt.158 Motion to table amendment SA 158 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 66 - 33. Record Vote Number: 18.
02/07/2019SenateS.Amdt.158 Amendment SA 158 proposed by Senator Grassley for Senator Lankford to Amendment SA 111. (consideration: CR S1101, S1106-1109; text: CR S1101) To modify the provision relating to the Land and Water Conservation Fund to impose certain requirements on the Federal acquisition of land and to require an allocation of funds for the deferred maintenance backlog.
02/07/2019SenateS.Amdt.111 Amendment SA 111 proposed by Senator Murkowski. (consideration: CR S1031-1101; text: CR S1031-1101) In the nature of a substitute.
02/07/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S1031-1109)
02/07/2019SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
02/07/2019SenateMotion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (CR S1031)
02/06/2019SenateMotion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (CR S876)
02/05/2019SenateMotion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (CR S858)
02/05/2019SenateCloture on the motion to proceed to the measure invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 99 - 1. Record Vote Number: 17. (CR S858)
01/31/2019SenateCloture motion on the motion to proceed to the consideration of measure presented in Senate. (CR S777)
01/31/2019SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S777)
01/09/2019SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 7.
01/08/2019SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.

Committees (0)

As of 10/18/2019 text has not been received for S.47 - John D. Dingell, Jr. Conservation, Management, and Recreation Act

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (145)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.47. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/08/2019)

Natural Resources Management Act

This bill sets forth provisions regarding various programs, projects, activities, and studies for the management and conservation of natural resources on federal lands.

Specifically, the bill addresses, among other matters

  • land conveyances, exchanges, acquisitions, withdrawals, and transfers;
  • national parks, monuments, memorials, wilderness areas, wild and scenic rivers, historic and heritage sites, and other conservation and recreation areas;
  • wildlife conservation;
  • helium extraction;
  • small miner waivers of claim maintenance fees;
  • wildland fire operations;
  • the release of certain federal reversionary land interests;
  • boundary adjustments;
  • the Denali National Park and Preserve natural gas pipeline;
  • fees for medical services in units of the National Park System;
  • funding for the Land and Water Conservation Fund;
  • recreational activities on federal or nonfederal lands;
  • a national volcano early warning and monitoring system;
  • federal reclamation projects; and
  • search-and recovery-missions.

In addition, the bill reauthorizes the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Historic Preservation Program and the National Cooperative Geologic Mapping Program.