There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Community-Based Response Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for a Community-Based Emergency and Non-Emergency Response Grant Program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/01/2020Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
10/01/2020Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 10/25/2020
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 10/26/2020
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/10/2020
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 11/12/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions10/01/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.4791. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (10/01/2020)

Community-Based Response Act

This bill establishes a program to assist communities with implementing alternative emergency response models in vulnerable populations to resolve crisis situations that may not require a law enforcement response or situations where a law enforcement response may increase the risk of harm.

Specifically, the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS), in consultation with the Department of Housing and Urban Development and the Department of Justice, must award grants to eligible partnerships to establish or expand these models. The partnerships must consist of a unit of local or tribal government that is independent of law enforcement agencies and a nonprofit, community-based organization or consortium of such organizations. The partnerships may also include other entities, such as nonprofit or public institutions of higher education and behavioral health organizations.

A partnership may use grant funds for a variety of purposes, such as triaging 9–1–1 calls to refer certain emergencies to entities other than law enforcement. In awarding these grants, HHS must prioritize partnerships that include community-based organizations that have a record of effectively serving, and are led by members of, vulnerable populations.