There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the outstation of the Department of Veterans Affairs in North Ogden, Utah, as the Major Brent Taylor Vet Center Outstation.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
03/21/2019Became Public Law No: 116-10. (TXT | PDF)
03/21/2019Signed by President.
03/11/2019Presented to President.
03/05/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 0 (Roll no. 105).(text: CR H2337-2338)
02/05/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S847-848)
02/05/2019Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S847-848)
01/08/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
03/21/2019Became Public Law No: 116-10. (TXT | PDF)
03/21/2019Signed by President.
03/11/2019SenatePresented to President.
03/05/2019-7:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/05/2019-7:09pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 0 (Roll no. 105). (text: CR H2337-2338)
03/05/2019-6:58pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2341)
03/05/2019-5:31pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/05/2019-5:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 49.
03/05/2019-5:16pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2337-2340)
03/05/2019-5:16pmHouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/08/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/06/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
02/06/2019-12:17pmHouseReceived in the House.
02/05/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/05/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S847-848)
02/05/2019SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S847-848)
01/08/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Romney, Mitt [R-UT]* 01/08/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs01/08/2019 Referred to
02/05/2019 Discharged from
House Veterans' Affairs02/06/2019 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health02/08/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.49. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (03/05/2019)

This bill designates the outstation of the Department of Veterans Affairs in North Ogden, Utah, as the "Major Brent Taylor Vet Center Outstation."