There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Restore Our Parks Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Restore Our Parks Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 54, United States Code, to establish, fund, and provide for the use of amounts in a National Park Service Legacy Restoration Fund to address the maintenance backlog of the National Park Service, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
02/25/2020Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
02/14/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
02/25/2020Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 428.
Action By: Senate
02/25/2020Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
11/19/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
02/14/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 02/14/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 02/25/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 02/26/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/26/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 02/27/2019
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 02/28/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/04/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 03/06/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 03/25/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/25/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 04/30/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 05/08/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/15/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/13/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 06/18/2019
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/19/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 09/19/2019
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 09/24/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 10/31/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/19/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 11/19/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 12/10/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 12/19/2019
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 12/19/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 12/19/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 02/25/2020
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 02/27/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/14/2019 Referred to
11/19/2019 Markup by
02/25/2020 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.500. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (02/25/2020)

Restore Our Parks Act

This bill (1) establishes the National Park Service Legacy Restoration Fund, and (2) requires 50% of all energy development revenues for FY2020-FY2024 to be deposited into such fund.

Amounts deposited in the fund must not exceed $1.3 billion for any fiscal year and must be used for meeting the priority deferred maintenance needs of the National Park Service.