There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Restore Our Parks Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 54, United States Code, to establish, fund, and provide for the use of amounts in a National Park Service Legacy Restoration Fund to address the maintenance backlog of the National Park Service, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/14/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
02/14/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 02/14/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 02/25/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 02/26/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/26/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 02/27/2019
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 02/28/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/04/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 03/06/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 03/25/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/25/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 04/30/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 05/08/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/15/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/13/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 06/18/2019
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/19/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 09/19/2019
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 09/24/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/14/2019 Referred to

As of 10/18/2019 no related bill information has been received for S.500 - Restore Our Parks Act


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.