There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

LEGION Act
Let Everyone Get Involved in Opportunities for National Service Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

LEGION Act
Let Everyone Get Involved in Opportunities for National Service Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 36, United States Code, to authorize The American Legion to determine the requirements for membership in The American Legion, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
07/30/2019Became Public Law No: 116-35.
07/30/2019Signed by President.
07/29/2019Presented to President.
07/23/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7220-7221)
06/11/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S3326-3327)
06/11/2019Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3326-3327)
02/14/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
07/30/2019Became Public Law No: 116-35.
07/30/2019Signed by President.
07/29/2019SenatePresented to President.
07/23/2019-6:35pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2019-6:35pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7220-7221)
07/23/2019-6:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 504.
07/23/2019-6:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7220-7222)
07/23/2019-6:30pmHouseMr. Correa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/28/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/12/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
06/12/2019-1:13pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/12/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/11/2019SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3326-3327)
06/11/2019SenateS.Amdt.252 Amendment SA 252 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
06/11/2019SenateS.Amdt.252 Amendment SA 252 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Tillis. (consideration: CR S3326; text: CR S3326) To expand eligibility for membership in The American Legion and to prohibit discrimination with respect to staff positions.
06/11/2019SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3326-3327)
02/14/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary02/14/2019 Referred to
06/11/2019 Discharged from
House Judiciary06/12/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship06/28/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.