There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Deborah Sampson Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Deborah Sampson Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the benefits and services provided by the Department of Veterans Affairs to women veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/15/2020Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Moran with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
02/14/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
09/15/2020Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 536.
Action By: Senate
09/15/2020Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Moran with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
08/05/2020Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
05/22/2019Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
02/14/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 02/25/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 02/28/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 03/05/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 03/14/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 04/29/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 04/30/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/21/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 06/10/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/13/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 06/18/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/26/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/16/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/22/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 11/05/2019
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 11/07/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 11/12/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 11/21/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/24/2020
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/09/2020
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/13/2020
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 08/03/2020
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 08/04/2020
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/08/2020
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/16/2020
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 09/23/2020
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/23/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs02/14/2019 Referred to
05/22/2019 Hearings by
08/05/2020 Markup by
09/15/2020 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.