There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Social Security Fairness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title II of the Social Security Act to repeal the Government pension offset and windfall elimination provisions.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/14/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
02/14/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 02/14/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/25/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/05/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/05/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/06/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 03/07/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 03/13/2019
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/14/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/14/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 03/14/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/14/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 03/26/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/26/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 03/26/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/26/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 03/26/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/26/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 03/26/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/26/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 03/27/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/27/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 03/28/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 03/28/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 04/01/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/02/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/09/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/29/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 04/29/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 07/16/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/17/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 09/11/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 09/16/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 10/29/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 12/02/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 01/13/2020
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 03/05/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance02/14/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.521. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/14/2019)

Social Security Fairness Act

This bill repeals provisions that reduce Social Security benefits for individuals who receive other benefits, such as a pension from a state or local government job.

The bill eliminates the government pension offset, which in various instances reduces Social Security survivors' benefits for spouses, widows, and widowers who also receives government pensions of their own.

The bill also eliminates the windfall elimination provision, which in some instances reduces Social Security benefits for individuals who also receive a pension or disability benefit from an employer that did not withhold Social Security taxes.