There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Never Forget the Heroes: Permanent Authorization of the September 11th Victim Compensation Fund Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to extend authorization for the September 11th Victim Compensation Fund of 2001 through fiscal year 2090, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/25/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
02/25/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (75)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 02/25/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 02/25/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 02/25/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 02/25/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 02/25/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 02/25/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/25/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 02/25/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 02/25/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 02/25/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 02/25/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/25/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 02/25/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 02/25/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 02/25/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 02/25/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 02/25/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/25/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 02/25/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 02/25/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 02/25/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 02/27/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/06/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/11/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 03/13/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 03/13/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 03/14/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 03/25/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 03/26/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/26/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 03/26/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 04/01/2019
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/29/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 04/30/2019
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 05/07/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 05/09/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 05/23/2019
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 06/03/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/12/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/12/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 06/13/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/13/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 06/18/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 06/18/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 06/18/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 06/19/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 06/19/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 06/20/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/24/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/24/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/24/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/24/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/24/2019
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/24/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/24/2019
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 06/24/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/24/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/25/2019
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/25/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/25/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 06/26/2019
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 06/26/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 06/27/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/27/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 06/27/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 06/28/2019
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 06/28/2019
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/08/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 07/08/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/08/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 07/08/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 07/15/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/16/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 07/18/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 07/23/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary02/25/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.546. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/25/2019)

Never Forget the Heroes: Permanent Authorization of the September 11th Victim Compensation Fund Act

This bill funds through FY2090 the September 11th Victim Compensation Fund of 2001.

Additionally, the bill modifies the Victim Compensation Fund (VCF):

  • to allow claims to be filed until October 2089,
  • to require VCF policies and procedures to be reassessed at least once every five years (currently, at least once annually),
  • to require claimants to be paid for the amount by which a claim was reduced on the basis of insufficient funding,
  • to remove the cap on noneconomic damages in certain circumstances, and
  • to adjust the annual limit on economic loss compensation for inflation.