There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

ALS Disability Insurance Access Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

ALS Disability Insurance Access Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

ALS Disability Insurance Access Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title II of the Social Security Act to eliminate the five-month waiting period for disability insurance benefits under such title for individuals with amyotrophic lateral sclerosis.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/22/2020Became Public Law No: 116-250. (TXT | PDF)
12/22/2020Signed by President.
12/11/2020Presented to President.
12/08/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
12/02/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate, under the order of 12/01/20, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 96 - 1. Record Vote Number: 250.(text: CR S7164)
12/02/2020Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7157, S7163-7164)
02/27/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/22/2020Became Public Law No: 116-250. (TXT | PDF)
12/22/2020Signed by President.
12/11/2020SenatePresented to President.
12/08/2020-3:27pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/08/2020-3:27pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6988)
12/08/2020-2:59pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 578.
12/08/2020-2:59pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6988-6991)
12/08/2020-2:59pmHouseMr. Larson (CT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/03/2020-3:18pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/03/2020-3:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/03/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/02/2020SenatePassed Senate, under the order of 12/01/20, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 96 - 1. Record Vote Number: 250. (text: CR S7164)
12/02/2020SenateS.Amdt.2689 Amendment SA 2689, under the order of 12/01/20, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 48 - 49. Record Vote Number: 249.
12/02/2020SenateS.Amdt.2689 Amendment SA 2689 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Grassley. (consideration: CR S7157, S7163; text: CR S7182-7183) To increase the overpayment collection threshold for old-age, survivors, and disability insurance benefits.
12/02/2020SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
12/02/2020SenateSenate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7157, S7163-7164)
02/27/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Cosponsors (67)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 02/27/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/28/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 03/25/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/16/2019
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/23/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 06/13/2019
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 06/18/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 06/18/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 06/19/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 06/27/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 09/09/2019
Sen. Loeffler, Kelly [R-GA] 01/09/2020
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 01/14/2020
Sen. Romney, Mitt [R-UT] 01/14/2020
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 01/15/2020
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 01/15/2020
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 01/21/2020
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 01/28/2020
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 02/12/2020
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 03/02/2020
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 03/03/2020
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/05/2020
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 03/05/2020
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 06/04/2020
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/04/2020
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 06/17/2020
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/17/2020
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/24/2020
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 10/01/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Finance02/27/2019 Referred to
12/02/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.578. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-250 (12/22/2020)

ALS Disability Insurance Access Act of 2019

This bill eliminates the five-month waiting period for disability benefits under the Old Age, Survivors, and Disability Insurance program for individuals with amyotrophic lateral sclerosis (a progressive neurodegenerative disease, also known as Lou Gehrig's disease, that affects nerve cells in the brain and spinal cord). Under current law, individuals must wait five months after becoming disabled before their disability insurance benefit payments may begin.