There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

ALS Disability Insurance Access Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title II of the Social Security Act to eliminate the five-month waiting period for disability insurance benefits under such title for individuals with amyotrophic lateral sclerosis.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/27/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
02/27/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (67)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 02/27/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/28/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 03/25/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/16/2019
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/23/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 06/13/2019
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 06/18/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 06/18/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 06/19/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 06/27/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 09/09/2019
Sen. Loeffler, Kelly [R-GA] 01/09/2020
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 01/14/2020
Sen. Romney, Mitt [R-UT] 01/14/2020
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 01/15/2020
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 01/15/2020
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 01/21/2020
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 01/28/2020
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 02/12/2020
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 03/02/2020
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 03/03/2020
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/05/2020
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 03/05/2020
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 06/04/2020
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/04/2020
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 06/17/2020
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/17/2020
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/24/2020
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 10/01/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance02/27/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.578. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/27/2019)

ALS Disability Insurance Access Act of 2019

This bill eliminates the five-month waiting period for Old Age, Survivors, and Disability Insurance benefits for individuals with amyotrophic lateral sclerosis (a progressive neurodegenerative disease, also known as Lou Gehrig's disease, that affects nerve cells in the brain and spinal cord). Under current law, individuals must wait five months after becoming disabled before their disability insurance benefit payments may begin.