There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Presidential Allowance Modernization Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Presidential Allowance Modernization Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Act of August 25, 1958, commonly known as the "Former Presidents Act of 1958", with respect to the monetary allowance payable to a former President, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
06/27/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-53.
02/27/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
06/27/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 128.
Action By: Senate
06/27/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-53.
05/15/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
02/27/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 03/11/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 05/16/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 12/10/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs02/27/2019 Referred to
05/15/2019 Markup by
06/27/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-53

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.580. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/27/2019)

Presidential Allowance Modernization Act of 2019

This bill replaces provisions governing the compensation provided to a former President.

Each former President shall receive from the United States (1) an annuity of $200,000 per year for the remainder of his or her life, and (2) a monetary allowance of $200,000 per year. Such allowance shall be reduced by the amount the former President's earned income exceeds $400,000. These monetary amounts are subject to a cost-of-living increase.

The bill increases and provides for cost-of-living adjustments to the monetary allowance for surviving spouses of former Presidents.