There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Hidden Figures Congressional Gold Medal Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Hidden Figures Congressional Gold Medal Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to award Congressional Gold Medals to Katherine Johnson and Dr. Christine Darden, to posthumously award Congressional Gold Medals to Dorothy Vaughan and Mary Jackson, and to award a Congressional Gold Medal to honor all of the women who contributed to the success of the National Aeronautics and Space Administration during the Space Race.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
03/27/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S2061-2062)
03/27/2019Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2061-2062)
02/27/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/29/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/29/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/29/2019-2:32pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/28/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/27/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2061-2062)
03/27/2019SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2061-2062)
02/27/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (71)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/27/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ]* 02/27/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 03/07/2019
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 03/07/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 03/07/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 03/07/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/07/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/11/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/14/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 03/26/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/26/2019

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs02/27/2019 Referred to
03/27/2019 Discharged from
House Financial Services03/29/2019 Referred to
Committee on House Administration03/29/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.590. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (03/27/2019)

Hidden Figures Congressional Gold Medal Act

(Sec. 3) This bill requires the Speaker of the House of Representatives and President pro tempore of the Senate to arrange for the presentation of

  • one Congressional Gold Medal to Katherine Johnson, in recognition of her service to the United States as a mathematician;
  • one Congressional Gold Medal to Dr. Christine Darden, for her service to the United States as an aeronautical engineer;
  • two Congressional Gold Medals in commemoration of the lives of Dorothy Vaughan and Mary Jackson, in recognition of their service to the United States during the Space Race; and
  • one gold medal in recognition of all the women who served as computers, mathematicians, and engineers at the National Advisory Committee for Aeronautics and the National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA) between the 1930s and the 1970s.

Certain of such medals shall be given to the Smithsonian Institution where they shall be (1) available for display, as appropriate; and (2) made available for research.

The medal awarded in honor of Mary Jackson shall be given to her granddaughter, Wanda Jackson.

(Sec. 4) The Department of the Treasury may strike and sell bronze duplicates. Amounts received from the sale of such medals shall be deposited into the U.S. Mint Public Enterprise Fund.