There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Washington, D.C. Admission Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the admission of the State of Washington, D.C. into the Union.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/28/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
02/28/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 02/28/2019
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 03/06/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/14/2019
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/25/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/26/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/18/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/18/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/07/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 06/08/2020
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/15/2020
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 06/15/2020
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/16/2020
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/23/2020
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/02/2020
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/02/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs02/28/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.631. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/28/2019)

Washington, D.C. Admission Act

This bill provides for admission into the United States of the state of Washington, Douglass Commonwealth, composed of most of the territory of the District of Columbia. The commonwealth shall be admitted to the Union on an equal footing with the other states.

The Mayor of the District of Columbia shall issue a proclamation for the first elections to Congress of two Senators and one Representative of the commonwealth.

The bill applies current District laws to the commonwealth and continues pending judicial proceedings.

The commonwealth (1) shall consist of all District territory, with specified exclusions for federal buildings and monuments, including the principal federal monuments, the White House, the Capitol Building, the U.S. Supreme Court Building, and the federal executive, legislative, and judicial office buildings located adjacent to the Mall and the Capitol Building; and (2) may not impose taxes on federal property except as Congress permits.

The bill maintains (1) the District as the seat of the federal government, and (2) the federal government's authority over military lands and specified other property.

The bill provides for expedited consideration of a joint resolution repealing the 23rd Amendment to the Constitution, which provides for the appointment of electors of the President and Vice President.