There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

HAVEN Act
Honoring American Veterans in Extreme Need Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to exempt from the calculation of monthly income certain benefit paid by the Department of Veterans Affairs and the Department of Defense.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/06/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
03/06/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/12/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 03/12/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 03/14/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 03/14/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 04/03/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/03/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 04/03/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 04/03/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 04/09/2019
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 04/09/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/30/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 04/30/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/08/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 05/08/2019
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/13/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/13/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/13/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 05/13/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 05/22/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/22/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary03/06/2019 Referred to

As of 05/24/2019 no related bill information has been received for S.679 - HAVEN Act.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.