Text: S.682 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/06/2019)


116th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. 682


To restore the Federal Communications Commission's Open Internet Order and its net neutrality protections.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

March 6, 2019

Mr. Markey (for himself, Mr. Schumer, Ms. Cantwell, Mr. Schatz, Mr. Wyden, Ms. Baldwin, Mr. Bennet, Mr. Blumenthal, Mr. Booker, Mr. Brown, Mr. Cardin, Mr. Carper, Mr. Casey, Mr. Coons, Ms. Cortez Masto, Ms. Duckworth, Mr. Durbin, Mrs. Feinstein, Mrs. Gillibrand, Ms. Harris, Ms. Hassan, Mr. Heinrich, Ms. Hirono, Mr. Jones, Mr. Kaine, Mr. King, Ms. Klobuchar, Mr. Leahy, Mr. Manchin, Mr. Menendez, Mr. Merkley, Mr. Murphy, Mrs. Murray, Mr. Peters, Mr. Reed, Ms. Rosen, Mr. Sanders, Mrs. Shaheen, Ms. Smith, Ms. Stabenow, Mr. Tester, Mr. Udall, Mr. Van Hollen, Mr. Warner, Ms. Warren, and Mr. Whitehouse) introduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation


A BILL

To restore the Federal Communications Commission's Open Internet Order and its net neutrality protections.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Save the Internet Act of 2019”.

SEC. 2. Restoration of Open Internet Order.

(a) Definitions.—In this section—

(1) the term “Commission” means the Federal Communications Commission; and

(2) the term “rule” has the meaning given the term in section 804 of title 5, United States Code.

(b) Repeal of rule.—The Declaratory Ruling, Report and Order, and Order in the matter of restoring internet freedom that was adopted by the Commission on December 14, 2017 (FCC 17–166), shall have no force or effect.

(c) Prohibition on reissued rule or new rule.—The Commission may not reissue the Declaratory Ruling, Report and Order, and Order described in subsection (b) in substantially the same form, or issue a new rule that is substantially the same as that Declaratory Ruling, Report and Order, and Order, unless the reissued or new rule is specifically authorized by a law enacted after the date of enactment of this Act.

(d) Restoration of repealed and amended regulations.—The following are restored as in effect on January 19, 2017:

(1) The Report and Order on Remand, Declaratory Ruling, and Order in the matter of protecting and promoting the open internet that was adopted by the Commission on February 26, 2015 (FCC 15–24).

(2) Part 8 of title 47, Code of Federal Regulations.

(3) Any other rule of the Commission that was amended or repealed by the Declaratory Ruling, Report and Order, and Order described in subsection (b).