There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Middle Class Health Benefits Tax Repeal Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to repeal the excise tax on high-cost employer-sponsored health coverage.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/06/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
03/06/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/06/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/25/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 03/25/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 03/26/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 03/26/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 04/04/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 04/04/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 04/11/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 04/11/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/06/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 05/06/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 05/08/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 05/08/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/15/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 05/15/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 06/11/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 06/11/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 06/13/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 06/13/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 06/27/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/24/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/25/2019
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 07/25/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/29/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/29/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/29/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 07/29/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 08/01/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 08/01/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 08/01/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 08/01/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 08/01/2019
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 08/01/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 08/01/2019
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 08/01/2019
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 08/01/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/01/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 08/01/2019
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 08/01/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/09/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance03/06/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.684. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/06/2019)

Middle Class Health Benefits Tax Repeal Act of 2019

This bill repeals the excise tax on employer-sponsored health care coverage for which there is an excess benefit (high-cost plans). The repeal applies to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019.