There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

National POW/MIA Flag Act

Short Titles as Introduced

National POW/MIA Flag Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 36, United States Code, to require that the POW/MIA flag be displayed on all days that the flag of the United States is displayed on certain Federal property.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/02/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S2624)
05/02/2019Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2624)
03/07/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date Chamber
05/20/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/07/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
05/07/2019-2:09pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/06/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/02/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2624)
05/02/2019SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2624)
03/07/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 03/07/2019
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 03/07/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ]* 03/07/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/14/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 03/14/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/11/2019
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 04/30/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary03/07/2019 Referred to
05/02/2019 Discharged from
House Judiciary05/07/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties05/20/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.693. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (05/02/2019)

National POW/MIA Flag Act

The bill changes the days on which the POW/MIA flag is required to be displayed at specified locations to all days on which the U.S. flag is displayed. (Current law requires the POW/MIA flag to be displayed only on Armed Forces Day, Memorial Day, Flag Day, Independence Day, National POW/MIA Recognition Day, and Veterans Day.)