There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Anti-Border Corruption Improvement Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Anti-Border Corruption Improvement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Anti-Border Corruption Act of 2010 to authorize certain polygraph waiver authority, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/10/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-99.
03/07/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
09/10/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 202.
Action By: Senate
09/10/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-99.
06/19/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
03/07/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 03/13/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs03/07/2019 Referred to
06/19/2019 Markup by
09/10/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-99

As of 09/23/2019 no related bill information has been received for S.731 - Anti-Border Corruption Improvement Act


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.