There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Internet of Things Cybersecurity Improvement Act of 2019
IoT Cybersecurity Improvement Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Internet of Things Cybersecurity Improvement Act of 2019
IoT Cybersecurity Improvement Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to leverage Federal Government procurement power to encourage increased cybersecurity for Internet of Things devices, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/23/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-112.
03/11/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
09/23/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 215.
Action By: Senate
09/23/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-112.
06/19/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/11/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 03/11/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 03/11/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 03/11/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 05/20/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 05/20/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs03/11/2019 Referred to
06/19/2019 Markup by
09/23/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-112

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.734. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/11/2019)

Internet of Things Cybersecurity Improvement Act of 2019 or the IoT Cybersecurity Improvement Act of 2019

This bill requires the National Institute of Standards and Technology (NIST) and the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) to take specified steps to increase cybersecurity for Internet of Things (IoT) devices. IoT is the extension of Internet connectivity into physical devices and everyday objects.

The bill establishes September 30, 2019, as the deadline for the completion of NIST's efforts regarding considerations for managing IoT cybersecurity risks, especially regarding examples of possible cybersecurity capabilities of IoT devices. By March 31, 2020, NIST must develop recommendations for the appropriate use and management of IoT devices owned or controlled by the government, including minimum information security requirements for managing cybersecurity risks.

The OMB shall then issue guidelines for each agency that are consistent with such recommendations.

NIST and the OMB shall publish guidance on policies and procedures for the reporting, coordinating, publishing, and receiving of information about a security vulnerability relating to an IoT device used by the government and the resolution of such security vulnerability.