There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Building Blocks of STEM Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Building Blocks of STEM Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Building Blocks of STEM Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to direct the National Science Foundation to support STEM education research focused on early childhood.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/26/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
08/16/2019Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 without amendment. With written report No. 116-78.
03/11/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
10/01/2019-11:56amHouseHeld at the desk.
10/01/2019-9:03amHouseReceived in the House.
09/27/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/26/2019SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
09/26/2019SenateS.Amdt.944 Amendment SA 944 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/26/2019SenateS.Amdt.944 Amendment SA 944 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Rosen. (consideration: CR S5760-5761; text: CR S5760-5761) In the nature of a substitute.
09/26/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5760-5761)
08/16/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 180.
08/16/2019SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 without amendment. With written report No. 116-78.
05/15/2019SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/11/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation03/11/2019 Referred to
05/15/2019 Markup by
08/16/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-78

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.737. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/11/2019)

Building Blocks of STEM Act

This bill modifies National Science Foundation (NSF) grant programs that support STEM (science, technology, engineering, and mathematics, including computer science) education.

The bill instructs the NSF, when awarding grants under the Discovery Research PreK-12 program, to improve the focus of research and development on early childhood education.

The bill specifies that NSF grants to increase the participation of underrepresented populations in STEM fields may be used for research into various subjects regarding female students in prekindergarten through elementary school, including

  • the role of teachers and caregivers in encouraging or discouraging participation by such students in STEM activities, and
  • the types of STEM activities that encourage greater participation by such students.

The bill specifies that NSF grants to research computer science education and computational thinking may be used to support development and implementation of various tools and models for teaching and learning, including

  • developing and offering gender-inclusive computer science enrichment programs, and
  • acquainting female students in prekindergarten through elementary school with careers in computer science.