There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Merrill's Marauders Congressional Gold Medal Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Merrill's Marauders Congressional Gold Medal Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to award a Congressional Gold Medal to the soldiers of the 5307th Composite Unit (Provisional), commonly known as "Merrill's Marauders", in recognition of their bravery and outstanding service in the jungles of Burma during World War II.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/05/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S6895-6896)
12/05/2019Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6895-6896)
03/12/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date Chamber
12/09/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
12/09/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
12/09/2019-2:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/09/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/05/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6895-6896)
12/05/2019SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6895-6896)
03/12/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (76)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 03/12/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN]* 03/12/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 03/12/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 03/12/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 03/12/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 03/12/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 03/12/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 03/12/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 03/12/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/12/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL]* 03/12/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA]* 03/12/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 03/12/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 03/12/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 03/12/2019
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA]* 03/12/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 03/12/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 03/12/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/12/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/12/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 03/12/2019
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/27/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 05/08/2019
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 05/09/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/14/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/16/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 09/10/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 09/17/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 09/19/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 09/19/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 09/19/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 09/19/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 09/24/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/24/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 09/24/2019
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 09/24/2019
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/24/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/24/2019
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 09/24/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 09/25/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 09/25/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 09/25/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/26/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 09/26/2019
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 09/26/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/30/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 10/30/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/30/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 10/30/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/30/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 10/30/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 10/30/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 10/30/2019
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/30/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 10/30/2019
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 10/30/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 10/30/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 10/30/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/30/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 10/30/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 10/30/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/30/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/06/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 11/06/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/06/2019
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 11/12/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 11/12/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 11/12/2019
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 11/12/2019
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 11/12/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 11/12/2019
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 11/12/2019
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 11/12/2019
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 11/12/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 11/21/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 11/21/2019

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs03/12/2019 Referred to
12/05/2019 Discharged from
House Financial Services12/09/2019 Referred to
House Administration12/09/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.743. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/12/2019)

Merrill's Marauders Congressional Gold Medal Act

This bill directs Congress to award a Congressional Gold Medal to the 5307th Composite Unit (Provisional), commonly known as Merrill's Marauders, in recognition of their bravery and outstanding service in the jungles of Burma (Myanmar) during World War II.

Following its award, the gold medal shall be given to the Smithsonian Institution where it shall be displayed and made available for research.