There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Support for Veterans in Effective Apprenticeships Act of 2019

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Support for Veterans in Effective Apprenticeships Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Support for Veterans in Effective Apprenticeships Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Support for Veterans in Effective Apprenticeships Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to enable registered apprenticeship programs to better serve veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
03/26/2020Became Public Law No: 116-134. (TXT | PDF)
03/26/2020Signed by President.
03/16/2020Presented to President.
03/11/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 0 (Roll no. 97).
12/04/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(text: CR S6838-6839)
12/04/2019Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/12/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/26/2020Became Public Law No: 116-134. (TXT | PDF)
03/26/2020Signed by President.
03/16/2020SenatePresented to President.
03/11/2020-2:08pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/11/2020-2:08pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 0 (Roll no. 97). (text: 03/10/2020 CR H1574)
03/11/2020-2:00pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1613-1614)
03/10/2020-1:11pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/10/2020-1:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 760.
03/10/2020-1:01pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1574-1575)
03/10/2020-1:01pmHouseMrs. Lee (NV) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/04/2019-8:30pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/04/2019-7:31pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/04/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/04/2019SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S6838-6839)
12/04/2019SenateS.Amdt.1254 Amendment SA 1254 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6838; text: CR S6838)
12/04/2019SenateS.Amdt.1254 Amendment SA 1254 proposed by Senator Peters. In the nature of a substitute.
12/04/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6837-6839)
12/04/2019SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/12/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 03/12/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/01/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 05/13/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions03/12/2019 Referred to
12/04/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.760. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-134 (03/26/2020)

Support for Veterans in Effective Apprenticeships Act of 2019

This bill requires the Department of Labor to revise its registered apprenticeship programs to include additional program requirements for increasing the access of veterans and their survivors or dependents to such programs.

Labor must acquire written assurance that sponsors of apprenticeship programs (1) are aware of the availability of educational assistance for veterans and eligible individuals for use in such programs, (2) will make a good faith effort to obtain approval for such educational assistance for at least each program location that employs or recruits such recipients, and (3) will not deny a qualified applicant to avoid making a good faith effort to obtain approval for educational assistance.

In addition, Labor must (1) require program sponsors to provide standards that contain provisions to grant advanced standing or credit, (2) provide increased wages commensurate to such standing or credit for veterans or individuals eligible for educational assistance, and (3) provide a copy of the approved apprenticeship program's certificate of registration to the state approving agency.