There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Debbie Smith Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Debbie Smith Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Debbie Smith Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to strengthen programs authorized under the Debbie Smith Act of 2004.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
05/16/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2946-2948; text: CR S2947-2948)
05/09/2019Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Graham with amendments. Without written report.
03/14/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/31/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/20/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
05/20/2019-2:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/20/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/16/2019SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2946-2948; text: CR S2947-2948)
05/09/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 80.
05/09/2019SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Graham with amendments. Without written report.
05/02/2019SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
03/14/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Cosponsors (21)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary03/14/2019 Referred to
05/02/2019 Markup by
05/09/2019 Reported by
House Judiciary05/20/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security05/31/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.820. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (05/16/2019)

Debbie Smith Act of 2019

This bill reauthorizes grants that support state and local efforts to process DNA evidence in rape kits.

Specifically, it reauthorizes through FY2024 the following:

  • grants under the Debbie Smith DNA Backlog Grant Program;
  • grants to provide DNA training and education for law enforcement personnel, corrections personnel, and court officers; and
  • grants under the Sexual Assault Forensic Exam Program.