Text: S.831 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/14/2019)


116th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. 831


To direct the Secretary of the Interior to reissue final rules relating to listing the gray wolf in the Western Great Lakes and Wyoming under the Endangered Species Act of 1973.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

March 14, 2019

Mr. Johnson (for himself, Ms. Baldwin, Mr. Barrasso, and Mr. Enzi) introduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works


A BILL

To direct the Secretary of the Interior to reissue final rules relating to listing the gray wolf in the Western Great Lakes and Wyoming under the Endangered Species Act of 1973.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Reissuance of final rule regarding gray wolves in Western Great Lakes.

Before the end of the 60-day period beginning on the date of enactment of this Act, the Secretary of the Interior shall reissue the final rule published on December 28, 2011 (76 Fed. Reg. 81666), without regard to any other provision of statute or regulation that applies to issuance of such rule. Such reissuance shall not be subject to judicial review.

SEC. 2. Reissuance of final rule regarding gray wolves in Wyoming.

The final rule published on September 10, 2012 (77 Fed. Reg. 55530), that was reinstated on March 3, 2017, by the decision of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia (No. 14–5300) and further republished on May 1, 2017 (82 Fed. Reg. 20284–85), that reinstates the removal of Federal protections for the gray wolf in Wyoming under the Endangered Species Act of 1973, as amended, shall not be subject to judicial review.