Text: S.832 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-175 (10/20/2020)

 
[116th Congress Public Law 175]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]



[[Page 134 STAT. 848]]

Public Law 116-175
116th Congress

                                 An Act


 
To nullify the Supplemental Treaty Between the United States of America 
   and the Confederated Tribes and Bands of Indians of Middle Oregon, 
  concluded on November 15, 1865. <<NOTE: Oct. 20, 2020 -  [S. 832]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. NULLIFICATION OF TREATY.

    The Supplemental Treaty Between the United States of America and the 
Confederated Tribes and Bands of Indians of Middle Oregon, concluded on 
November 15, 1865, and entered into pursuant to the Senate resolution of 
ratification dated March 2, 1867 (14 Stat. 751), shall have no force or 
effect.

    Approved October 20, 2020.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S. 832:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

HOUSE REPORTS: No. 116-441 (Comm. on Natural Resources).
SENATE REPORTS: No. 116-45 (Comm. on Indian Affairs).
CONGRESSIONAL RECORD:
                                                        Vol. 165 (2019):
                                    June 27, considered and passed 
                                        Senate.
                                                        Vol. 166 (2020):
                                    Sept. 21, considered and passed 
                                        House.
DAILY COMPILATION OF PRESIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS (2020):
            Oct. 20, Presidential statement.

                                  <all>

Share This