There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Transit Infrastructure Vehicle Security Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 49, United States Code, to limit certain rolling stock procurements, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
04/09/2019Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/14/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
06/04/2019Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
04/09/2019Referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate
04/09/2019Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Senate
03/14/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 03/14/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/14/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/14/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 03/28/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 03/28/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 04/01/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/01/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 04/03/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/03/2019
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/09/2019
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 04/09/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 04/09/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 04/29/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 04/29/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 04/30/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/30/2019
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 04/30/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/02/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/02/2019
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 05/06/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/06/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/06/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 05/08/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/08/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 05/08/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 05/08/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 05/08/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 05/13/2019
Sen. Romney, Mitt [R-UT] 05/13/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/13/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 05/13/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 05/14/2019
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 05/14/2019
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/15/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 05/16/2019
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 05/16/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 05/16/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 05/20/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 05/20/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 05/21/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 05/21/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 05/23/2019
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 05/23/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 06/04/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/11/2019
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/13/2019
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/12/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 10/17/2019
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 11/12/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 12/16/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 12/16/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation03/14/2019 Referred to
04/09/2019 Discharged from
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs04/09/2019 Referred to
06/04/2019 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.846. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/14/2019)

Transit Infrastructure Vehicle Security Act

This bill prohibits the awarding of a contract to an entity for the procurement of rolling stock for use in public transportation if the manufacturer of the rolling stock is (1) incorporated or has manufacturing facilities in the United States; and (2) is owed or controlled by an entity based in a country that is identified as a nonmarket economy country, was identified by the Office of the U.S. Trade Representative (USTR) as a priority foreign country (e.g., a country that does not protect intellectual property rights), and is subject to monitoring by the USTR. This includes the People's Republic of China.

Any recipient of financial assistance for public transportation that operates a rail fixed guideway service must certify that it will not award any contract for the procurement of rail rolling stock for use in public transportation to a manufacturer of rolling stock that is described by this bill. A recipient that operates a rail fixed guideway public transportation system must certify that it has a written plan for identifying and reducing cybersecurity risks.